This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/19/2023 at 02:08:28 (UTC).

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association v. Coachella Valley Water District

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association filed an Other lawsuit against Coachella Valley Water District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sykes, Sunshine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9795

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sykes, Sunshine

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Respondent and Defendant

Coachella Valley Water District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

20969 Ventura Blvd., Suite 230

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

20969 Ventura Blvd., Suite 230

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Sara Marie McDuffie

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

20969 Ventura Blvd., Suite 230

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Michael G. Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Pamela Kentos Graham

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 03/10/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: by appellant's counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (43 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-7 (1606 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference declined.; Notes: Declined by court, prebriefing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Oct 26, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Sept 22, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sept 14, 2022; Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: PSC1904774; Trial Court Judge: Sykes, Sunshine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association is a litigant

Latest cases where COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT PUBLIC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM PAMELA KENTOS