This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/01/2022 at 03:23:49 (UTC).

Housing Authority of the City of Calexico et al. v. Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LP et al.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Housing Authority of the City of Calexico filed an Other lawsuit against Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LP. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderholt, L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9967

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Anderholt, L.

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Housing Authority of the City of Calexico

AMG & Associates, LLC

Multi-Housing Investments, LLC

Highridge Costa Investors, LLC

Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LP

Appellants and Defendants

Multi-Housing Investments, LLC

Highridge Costa Investors, LLC

Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven M. Walker

Attorney at Walker & Driskill, PLC

300 S. Imperial Ave., Ste. 10

El Centro, CA 92243

Julie Ann Herzog

18980 Ventura Blvd Ste 230

Tarzana, CA 91356-3233

Edward Francis Quigley

Attorney at Cox Castle & Nicholson

2049 Century Park E

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Cathy Tran Moses

Attorney at Cox, Castle & Nicholson

2029 Century Park East 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Edward Francis Quigley

Attorney at Cox Castle & Nicholson

2049 Century Park E

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Cathy Tran Moses

Attorney at Cox, Castle & Nicholson

2029 Century Park East 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: X-ARB due 20 days after ARB/X-RB filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: ARB/X-RB due 30 days after RB/X-AOB filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF. Due on 12/16/2022 By 28 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF. Due on 11/18/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice vacated.; Notes: The Rule 8.220(a) notice issued on September 22, 2022 is VACATED. Appellants' reply brief and cross-respondents' brief is due on or before October 19, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: Default notice issued this date, vacated per court's order dated 9/22/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Appendix and Respondent's Brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LP Attorney: Cathy Tran Moses Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Investments, LLC Attorney: Cathy Tran Moses Defendant and Appellant: Highridge Costa Investors, LLC Attorney: Cathy Tran Moses RA-2/330pgs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LP Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Investments, LLC Defendant and Appellant: Highridge Costa Investors, LLC Attorney: Cathy Tran Moses CIP in Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's Appendix and Respondent's Brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LPAttorney: Cathy Tran Moses Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Investments, LLCAttorney: Cathy Tran Moses Defendant and Appellant: Highridge Costa Investors, LLCAttorney: Cathy Tran Moses; Notes: RA-2/330pgs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Housing Authority of the City of Calexico Attorney: Julie Ann Herzog Plaintiff and Appellant: AMG & Associates, LLC Attorney: Julie Ann Herzog

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Housing Authority

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXIX, LPAttorney: Cathy Tran Moses Attorney: Edward Francis Quigley Defendant and Appellant: Multi-Housing Investments, LLC Defendant and Appellant: Highridge Costa Investors, LLC; Notes: X-ARB due 20 days after ARB/X-RB filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Due Date: 12/16/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Housing Authority of the City of CalexicoAttorney: Julie Ann Herzog Attorney: Steven M. Walker Plaintiff and Appellant: AMG & Associates, LLC; Notes: ARB/X-RB due 30 days after RB/X-AOB filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Housing Authority of the City of CalexicoAttorney: Julie Ann Herzog Plaintiff and Appellant: AMG & Associates, LLCAttorney: Julie Ann Herzog

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Housing Authority only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed Dec. 3, 2021 by HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF CALEXICO and AMG & ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Imperial County Superior Court - Main; County: Imperial; Trial Court Case Number: ECU000487; Trial Court Judge: Anderholt, L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Highridge Costa Investors is a litigant

Latest cases where AMG & ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSING AUTHORITH CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant