This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/08/2023 at 23:00:33 (UTC).

Hope Ranch Cattle Company, LLC v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 Hope Ranch Cattle Company, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Feeney, Jill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6726

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Feeney, Jill

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hope Ranch Cattle Company, LLC

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Jill T Feeney

Interested Party

Simone Vaca

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Myla Razel P. Sarmiento

Bradley R Greenman

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Presiding Judge

Interested Party Attorneys

Asa O Eaton

John Charles Carpenter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed February 27, 2023, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed February 27, 2023, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service for petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 1 volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less