This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/11/2023 at 10:43:01 (UTC).

Hooman Automotive Group et al. v. Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Hooman Automotive Group filed an Other lawsuit against Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen Shapiro, LLP. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahey, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2256

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fahey, William

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Hooman Automotive Group

Hooman Nissani

HK Automotive Group, Inc.

RHC Automotive, Inc.

RHH Automotive, Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Leigh Bradley

Stuart B. Esner

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Claudia L. Stone

Daniel L. Reback

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 10/20/2023 By 45 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 10/20/2023 By 45 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Additional handling attorney for respondent Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Daniel Reback from Nemecek & Cole, APC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 09/05/2023 By 60 Day(s) RBF +60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANTS' APPENDIX [VOLUME 2 OF 2 - PAGES 244 - 466] ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS AND APPELLANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANTS' APPENDIX [VOLUME 1 OF 2 - PAGES 1 - 243] ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS AND APPELLANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of change of firm name for counsel for appellants TO THE COURT AND ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that ESNER, CHANG & BOYER, counsel for Plaintiffs and Appellants Hooman Automotive Group, Hooman Nissani, HK Automotive Group, Inc., RHC Automotive, Inc., and RHH Automotive, Inc., has changed its name to ESNER, CHANG, BOYER & MURPHY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hooman Automotive Group Attorney: Stuart B. Esner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 10/20/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro, LLPAttorney: Claudia L. Stone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: AOB +30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: reporter (R-1).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 29, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #7839 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Substitution of attorney submitted on September 8, 2022 rejected due to former legal representative for plaintiff/appellant does not match what we have on file. (submitted 5 duplicate forms, all rejected)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hooman Automotive Group Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Hooman Nissani Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: HK Automotive Group, Inc. Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: RHC Automotive, Inc. Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: RHH Automotive, Inc. Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hooman Automotive GroupAttorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Hooman NissaniAttorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: HK Automotive Group, Inc.Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: RHC Automotive, Inc.Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: RHH Automotive, Inc.Attorney: Elizabeth Leigh Bradley Attorney: Stuart B. Esner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 25, 2022 by Hooman Automotive Group.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV45057; Trial Court Judge: Fahey, William

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less