This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/24/2023 at 01:00:20 (UTC).

Homeboy Industries, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 11/11/2022 Homeboy Industries, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Leiter, Maurice. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4502

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Leiter, Maurice

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Homeboy Industries, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Maurice A. Leiter

Interested Parties

Yvette Cardona

Jessie Cardona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Daniel R. Friedenthal

Jay D. Brown

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Steven R Vartazarian

Justin Rabi

Joseph John Nazarian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed November 14, 2022. The petition for writ of mandate is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Panel: EDMON, P. J., EGERTON, J. and RICHARDSON (ANNE K.), J.* * Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less