This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/23/2021 at 14:13:53 (UTC).

Hollywood v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Hollywood filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Oldendorf, Margaret. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3895

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Oldendorf, Margaret

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Arogant Hollywood

Pasadena, CA 91106

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Margaret L Oldendorf

Pasadena, CA 91101

Interested Party

Sovran Aquisition LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Helen Grayce Long

Attorney at H.G. Long and Associates

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Dennis Paul Block

Attorney at Law Office Dennis P. Block & Associates

5437 Laurel Canyon Blvd. 2Nd Floor

Valley Village, CA 91607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed July 29, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Arogant Hollywood

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Request to waive court fees. (Order included)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Filed petition for writ of mandate with a stay.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOVRAN ACQUISITION LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.