This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/25/2023 at 19:00:49 (UTC).

Hollywood and Ivar, LLC et al. v. DWG International, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Hollywood and Ivar, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DWG International, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Linfield, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0786

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Linfield, Michael

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Hollywood and Ivar, LLC

Freddy Braidi

Respondents and Defendants

DWG International, LLC

Hon. Michael P. Linfield

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Philip H. Stillman

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Elana Rebecca Levine

Michael Jeffrey Saltz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: 01:36:26--01:46:05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel with BlueJeans Oral Argument Instructions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Michael Saltz for respondent DWG International, LLC--30 min

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: All counsel with copy of court's tentative ruling.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: August 9, 2023 at 01:30 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Argument continued to:; Notes: August 9, 2023 at 1:30 p.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral arg - to court.; Notes: DWG International, LLC, Defendant and Respondent Elana Rebecca Levine, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral arg - to court.; Notes: Hollywood and Ivar, LLC, Plaintiff and Appellant Philip H. Stillman, Retained counsel Freddy Braidi, Plaintiff and Appellant Philip H. Stillman, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: This case is ordered on calendar for: July 12, 2023 at 01:30 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated July 18, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition summarily denied by order.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for a writ of supersedeas filed on June 8, 2022. The petition is denied. Panel: EDMON, P. J., LAVIN, J. and EGERTON, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hollywood and Ivar, LLC Attorney: Philip H. Stillman Plaintiff and Appellant: Freddy Braidi Attorney: Philip H. Stillman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hollywood and Ivar, LLCAttorney: Philip H. Stillman Plaintiff and Appellant: Freddy BraidiAttorney: Philip H. Stillman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two Volumes of Exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: Supersedeas/Request for STAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed May 2, 2022 by Hollywood and Ivar, LLC et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV19276; Trial Court Judge: Linfield, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less