This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/25/2023 at 03:09:08 (UTC).

Hoffman v. Palm Finance Corp.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 Hoffman filed an Other lawsuit against Palm Finance Corp. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mandel, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2178

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mandel, Elaine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Palm Finance Corp.

Appellant and Defendant

Susan H. Hoffman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

John Franklyn Kurtz

Attorney at Kurtz Law PLLC

910 W. Main Street Ste 364

Boise, ID 83702

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Philip H. Stillman

Attorney at Stillman & Associates

3015 North Bay Road Suite B

Miami Beach, FL 33140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: and appendix.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 30, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's motion to reinstate appeal filed on December 9, 2022. Good cause appearing, appellant's motion to reinstate appeal is granted, and the appeal dated July 19, 2022, is hereby reinstated on condition that appellant, within 15 days, file a designation of record with the clerk of the superior court, and pays all statutory fees/deposits pursuant to rule(s) 8.122, 8.124 or 8.130, California Rules of Court. Failure to comply with this relief order shall result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: appellant's motion to reinstate appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance of default dated 12/7/2022; failure to designate record, pay RT fees/deposits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed July 19, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance of default dated 11/10/22 LASC; failure to designate record, pay fees/deposits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Susan H. Hoffman Attorney: Philip H. Stillman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Due Date: 04/03/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Susan H. HoffmanAttorney: Philip H. Stillman; Notes: and appendix.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Susan H. HoffmanAttorney: Philip H. Stillman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 19, 2022 by Susan Hoffman. (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20SMCV00366; Trial Court Judge: Mandel, Elaine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less