This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/18/2023 at 07:05:01 (UTC).

H.M. v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 H M filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Breall, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6804

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Breall, Susan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

H. M.

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

San Francisco Human Services Agency

F. S.

M. S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ahtossa Piroozfar Fullerton

Tracy Marie De Soto

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the City Attorney

Julia Ten Eyck

James Thomas Bordelon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: In that petitioner acting in propria persona did not file a petition for extraordinary writ within the additional time granted by our January 18, 2023 order, which issued after counsel filed a timely no-issues statement pursuant to Glen C. v. Superior Court (2000) 78 Cal.App.4th 570, 580, the above-entitled action is dismissed as abandoned. (Karl S. v. Superior Court (1995) 34 Cal.App.4th 1397, 1404.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: In that petitioner acting in propria persona did not file a petition for extraordinary writ within the additional time granted by our January 18, 2023 order, which issued after counsel filed a timely no-issues statement pursuant to Glen C. v. Superior Court (2000) 78 Cal.App.4th 570, 580, the above-entitled action is dismissed as abandoned. (Karl S. v. Superior Court (1995) 34 Cal.App.4th 1397, 1404.)Note: No petition by petitioner H.M., due by 5 p.m. (see 1/18/23 order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On January 15, 2023, petitioner's counsel, Tracy M. De Soto, filed a letter, pursuant to Glen C. v. Superior Court (2000) 78 Cal.App.4th 570, 580, explaining counsel found no arguable meritorious issues upon which to challenge the order setting a Welfare and Institutions Code 366.26 hearing for April 5, 2023. Petitioner H.M. may file and serve a petition presenting petitioner's own arguments on or before 5:00 p.m., January 30, 2023. If petitioner does not file a petition within the time allowed, the filing of the record in this matter will be stricken and any subsequent appellate review of the order setting the hearing will be precluded. (Welf. & Inst. Code, 366.26(l).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Notes: Petitioner: H. M. Attorney: Tracy Marie De Soto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketBrief: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Party Attorney: Petitioner: H. M.Attorney: Tracy Marie De Soto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Ahtoss Fullerton, attorney for petitioner, associates Tracy De Soto, to represent H.M. in all matters in the Court of appeal related to this proceeding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: Record is complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: One volume

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: "Transmittal"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: Two Volumes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: W & I 366.26 Hearing in April 5, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: from Ahtossa Fullerton, attorney for H. M., mother

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: JD213051; Trial Court Judge: Breall, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less