This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/20/2021 at 07:08:34 (UTC).

HIPSHER v. LOS ANGELES COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES)

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 HIPSHER filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6772

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Tod Hipsher

County of Los Angeles

Respondents

State of California

Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association

Appellant and Interested Party

County of Los Angeles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Jacob A, Kalinski

16130 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 600

Encino, CA 91436-2161

Jacob A. Kalinski

Attorney at Rains Lucia Stern St. Phalle & Silver, PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 600

Encino, CA 91436-2161

Steven M. Berliner

Attorney at Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

6033 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Joung H. Yim

Attorney at Liebert Cassidy & Whitmore

6033 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Erich W. Shiners

Attorney at Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

6033 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Respondent Attorneys

Anthony Paul O'Brien

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Anthony P. O'Brien

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Johanna M. Fontenot

Attorney at Attorney at Law

300 North Lake Avenue, Suite 620

Pasadena, CA 91101

Appellant and Interested Party Attorneys

Steven M. Berliner

Attorney at Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

6033 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Joung H. Yim

Attorney at Liebert Cassidy & Whitmore

6033 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Erich W. Shiners

Attorney at Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

6033 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tod Hipsher Attorney: Jacob A. Kalinski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Respondent: State of California Attorney: Anthony P. O'Brien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tod Hipsher Attorney: Jacob A. Kalinski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B276486; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BS153372

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNA is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johanna M. Fontenot