This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/13/2021 at 08:21:07 (UTC).

Hilton v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Hilton filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Vicencia, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4149

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Vicencia, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Courtney Hilton

Carson, CA 90745

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Michael P. Vicencia

Long Beach, CA 90802

Interested Parties

California Teacher Retirement System

Torrance Unified School District

American Fidelity Assurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Natalie Perrin-Smith Vance

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street Suite 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael Terrence Travis

Attorney at Parker & Covert LLP

17862 17Th Street Suite 204

Tustin, CA 92780

Karen T. Tsui

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Filed by Courtney Hilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed August 11, 2021, as well as the amended petition filed August 13, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: amended peremptory writ of mandate and request for stay received from petitionerincludes certificate of interested persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Order waving filing fee granted on 03/26/2021. (Reference case number B311277)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where American Fidelity Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant