This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/02/2022 at 23:26:42 (UTC).

HILTON v. S.C. (CALSTRS)

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 HILTON filed an Other lawsuit against C CALSTRS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0476

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Courtney Hilton

Carson, CA 90745

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

CALSTRS

Torrance Unified School District

American Fidelity Assurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Natalie Perrin-Smith Vance

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street Suite 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael Terrence Travis

Attorney at Parker & Covert LLP

17862 17Th Street Suite 204

Tustin, CA 92780

Karen T. Tsui

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 18, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay application filed (separate petition pending); Notes: Amended Stay Application. Courtney Hilton, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Courtney Hilton Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B314149; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20CMCV00295; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV42664

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Fidelity Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CALSTRS is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant