This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/26/2023 at 08:39:16 (UTC).

HILTON v. CALIFORNIA TEACHER RETIREMENT CALSTRS

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 HILTON filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA TEACHER RETIREMENT CALSTRS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0249

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Courtney Hilton

Defendants and Respondents

California Teacher Retirement Calstrs

Torrance Unified School District

American Fidelity Assurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Natalie Perrin Vance

Michael Terrence Travis

Karen T. Tsui

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/11/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied; Notes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., was absent and did not participate.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended Stay Request Courtney Hilton, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney Hilton Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney Hilton Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311954; Disposition: Other involuntary dismissal; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV42664

[+] Read More [-] Read Less