This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/13/2021 at 21:07:31 (UTC).

Hilton v. California State Teacher Retirement System CALSTRS et al.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Hilton filed an Other lawsuit against California State Teacher Retirement System CALSTRS. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3521

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Courtney Hilton

Carson, CA 90745

Respondents and Defendants

California State Teacher Retirement System CALSTRS et al.

Torrance Unified School District

American Fidelity Insurance

Los Angeles Superior Court

Others

Civil Code 51.1 (Unruh, Ralph, or Bane Civil Rights Acts)

Civil Code 55.2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Overton

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho

3801 University Avenue Suite 560

Riverside, CA 92501

Natalie Perrin-Smith Vance

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street Suite 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael Terrence Travis

Attorney at Parker & Covert LLP

17862 17Th Street Suite 204

Tustin, CA 92780

Karen T. Tsui

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Consumer Law Section

Attorney at Consumer Law Section

300 South Spring Street 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: This court is in receipt of the superior court clerk's October 13, 2021 Notice of Non-Compliance of Default for the appeal filed June 7, 2021 (U1), wherein appellant is defaulted for not providing proof of service on the notice of appeal. You are hereby notified that the clerk of the appellate court is allowing the case to move forward notwithstanding the clerk's notice of non-compliance of default on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Oct 13, 2021 - Failure to serve and file proof of service of notice of appeal[Appeal 6/7/2021: Courtney Hilton (U1)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statements submitted on August 25, 2021 and August 26, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney Hilton Pro Per (R2) **Appeals July 2, 2021 dismissal order and ensuing judgment.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney HiltonPro Per; Notes: (R2) **Appeals July 2, 2021 dismissal order and ensuing judgment.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (July 7, 2021 by Courtney Hilton - (R2) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 10, 2021: 8.122 w. RT - (R2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Response to this court's notice sent July 26, 2021(Appeal June 7, 2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee waiver granted on 3/26/2021 in case no. B311277 (R2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 7, 2021 by Courtney Hilton (R2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: After reviewing appellant's civil case information statement filed on July 22, 2021, it appears the appeal filed on June 7, 2021 was taken from a nonappealable order. Appellant is hereby requested to demonstrate in writing why the appeal should not be dismissed as having been taken from a nonappealable order, within 15 days of the date of this notice. Respondent may file a reply to the response within 10 days of the response file date. Failure by the appellant to respond within the time provided may result in the appeal being dismissed as taken from a nonappealable order. (Sherman v. Standard Mines Co. (1913) 166 Cal. 524, 525.) Any response shall have attached to it a proof of service. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25 (a)(1)-(2).)(Appeal June 7, 2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney Hilton Pro Per Notice of appeal filed 6/7/2021 by Courtney Hilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney HiltonPro Per; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 6/7/2021 by Courtney Hilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee waiver granted on 3/26/2021 in case no. B311277 (Courtney Hilton)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 6/7/2021 by Courtney Hilton(U1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CMCV00295

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Fidelity Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant