This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/19/2022 at 01:43:21 (UTC).

Hilton v. California State Teacher Retirement System

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Hilton filed an Other lawsuit against California State Teacher Retirement System. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Vicencia, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5300

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Vicencia, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Courtney Hilton

Carson, CA 90745

Respondents and Defendants

California State Teacher Retirement System

Torrance Unified School District

Los Angeles Superior Court

American Fidelity Assurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Overton

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis, Acho, & Associates, P.C.

3801 University Avenue Suite 560

Riverside, CA 92501

Natalie Perrin-Smith Vance

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street Suite 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael Washburn Carruth

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

801 K St Ste 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael Terrence Travis

Attorney at Parker & Covert LLP

17862 17Th Street Suite 204

Tustin, CA 92780

Karen T. Tsui

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: opposition/ruling due to appellant's motion to amend designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: appellant's motion to amend notice designating record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney Hilton Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has reviewed appellant's opening brief, received for filing on January 4, 2022. Permission to file the appellant's opening brief, including the request to include exhibits exceeding the ten-page limit, is hereby granted and filed this date. IT IS ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 02/07/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: American Fidelity Assurance CompanyAttorney: Karen T. Tsui

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 02/07/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Los Angeles Superior CourtAttorney: Sarah Overton

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney HiltonPro Per; Notes: (R3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Two appeals are pending in B315300, designated as "U2" and "R3" by the trial court. It is unclear for which appeal the civil case information statement was filed. Appellant must submit a separate civil case information statement for each appeal pending in B315300, clearly indicating for which appeal the document is submitted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) (Civil case information statement was submitted on October 19, 2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on October 19, 2021 returned due to document contains incorrect trial court case number and has attached to it documents pertaining to an incorrect trial court case number.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on October 18, 2021 returned due to document contains incorrect trial court case number and has attached to it documents pertaining to an incorrect trial court case number.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Aug. 25, 2021: Courtney Hilton - (R3) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Aug. 25, 2021: Courtney Hilton - (U2) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aug. 25, 2021: Courtney Hilton - (R3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: GRANTED waiver dated March 26, 2021 (re. B311277)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aug. 25, 2021: Courtney Hilton - (U2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV42664; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CMCV00295; Trial Court Judge: Vicencia, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Fidelity Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant