This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/10/2021 at 06:46:53 (UTC).

HILTON v. CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHER RETIREMENT CALSTRS

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 HILTON filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHER RETIREMENT CALSTRS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0256

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Courtney Hilton

Carson, CA 90745

Defendants and Respondents

California State Teacher Retirement Calstrs

Torrance Unified School District

American Fidelity Assurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Natalie Perrin-Vance

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street, Suite 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael Terrence Travis

Attorney at Parker & Covert LLP

17862 17Th Street, Suite 204 E

Tustin, CA 92780

Karen T. Tsui

Attorney at Burke Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed; Notes: Courtney Hilton, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Document entitled Amended Stay Request. Courtney Hilton, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney Hilton Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Courtney Hilton Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311956; Disposition: Other involuntary dismissal; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20CMCV00295

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Fidelity Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant