This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/02/2022 at 01:04:31 (UTC).

Hill v. Laar

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Hill filed an Other lawsuit against Laar. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3746

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Katherine Hill

Respondents and Defendants

Jennifer Van Laar

Mail Media, Inc.

Salem Media Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Ashley Noel Parris

Attorney at McElroy Parris Trial Lawyers,

407 Bryant Cir, Ste F.

Ojai, CA 93023-4228

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Harmeet Kaur Dhillon

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Kelli L. Sager

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Daniel A Laidman

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 S Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Abigail T. Zeitlin

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Douglas Joseph Collodel

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Holmes

Attorney at Clyde & Co

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Alison Katherine Beanum

Attorney at Clyde & Co. US LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: *No CIS - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Final (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: (R)It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed June 18, 2021(R), is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (June 18, 2021 by Katherine Hill - (R) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Ashley Parris.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Partial (R1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: (R1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (June 18, 2021: Katherine Hill - (R1) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: June 18, 2021 Katherine Hill (R)No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on June 18, 2021 by Katherine Hill (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: June 18, 2021 by Katherine HillNo fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on June 18, 2021 by Katherine Hill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (R1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: June 18, 2021: Katherine Hill - (R1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV48797

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAIL MEDIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SALEM MEDIA GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Holmes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas J. Collodel