This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/02/2023 at 01:21:40 (UTC).

Higgins v. Environmental Design Studios

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Higgins filed an Other lawsuit against Environmental Design Studios. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Feeney, Jill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2269

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Feeney, Jill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Kimberly K. Higgins

Respondent and Defendant

Environmental Design Studios

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

John P. Nicholas

Attorney at Mc Nicholas & Mc Nicholas

10866 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Justin Arnold Bubion

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

500 North Brand Blvd. Ste 1650

Glendale, CA 91203

Patrick J. Sarkissian

535 N Brand Blvd Ste 1100

Glendale, CA 91203-3933

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Appellant's proof of service of opening brief on superior court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Non-compliance to appellant re lack of service of opening brief on superior court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for judicial notice of tentative ruling in underlying case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kimberly K. Higgins Attorney: John P. Nicholas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 02/21/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Environmental Design StudiosAttorney: Justin Arnold Bubion Attorney: Patrick J. Sarkissian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kimberly K. HigginsAttorney: John P. Nicholas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: TWO: Clerks (354 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 17, 2022: 8.122 no RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #5000715 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 22, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kimberly K. Higgins Attorney: John P. Nicholas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kimberly K. HigginsAttorney: John P. Nicholas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 25, 2022 by Kimberly K. Higgins.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV18156; Trial Court Judge: Feeney, Jill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARKASSIAN PATRICK J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUBION JUSTIN