This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/09/2022 at 03:03:16 (UTC).

Herrera v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Herrera filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sahagun, Raul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7777

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sahagun, Raul

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Roberto Aguilar Herrera

Lancaster, CA 93539-8457

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Hon. Raul Anthony Sahagun

Norwalk Courthouse 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Dept. D

Norwalk, CA 90650

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed by petitioner in pro. per. on January 21, 2022. The petition for writ of mandate is denied for failure to provide a record adequate to permit review of petitioner's contentions, including the challenged order and a reporter's transcript of relevant proceedings (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 8.486(b)), and for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Panel: EDMON, P. J., LAVIN, J. and EGERTON, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Notice of non-compliance mailed to petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant