This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/22/2020 at 09:52:45 (UTC).

Hernandez et al. v. Potrero, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 Hernandez filed an Other lawsuit against Potrero, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fournier, Lori. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4658

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fournier, Lori

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Guadalupe Rojas

Miguel Rojas Hernandez

Appellant and Cross Defendant

California Force Patrol, Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

Potrero, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Jacob Libman

Gary Berkovich

Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Steven M. Polito

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Gopal Somabhai Patel

Mark Alan Weinstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final (Dec. 21, 2018: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: (Dec. 21, 2018: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Partial Jan. 18, 2019: Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: (Jan. 18, 2019: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: (Jan. 18, 2019: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Resent corrected default notice as to: (Jan. 18, 2019 appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No Fee Rcvd - (Jan. 18, 2019: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Jan. 18, 2019: California Force Patrol Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Cross-defendant and Appellant: California Force Patrol, Inc. Attorney: Steven M. Polito (Dec. 21, 2018: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Cross-defendant and Appellant: California Force Patrol, Inc.Attorney: Steven M. Polito; Notes: (Dec. 21, 2018: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 28, 2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# 18393 for $775 (Dec. 21, 2018: Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dec. 21, 2018: California Force Patrol, Inc., et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC649204; Trial Court Judge: Fournier, Lori

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less