This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/16/2022 at 19:01:53 (UTC).

Henry v. The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Henry filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomasson, Lauren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6356

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Thomasson, Lauren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Glen Roy Henry

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Interested Party

The People

Not Yet Classified

Office of the District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Nelson C. Lu

Attorney at San Joaquin County Public Defender

P.O. Box 201030

Stockton, CA 95201

Lois Keenan

Attorney at San Joaquin County Public Defender

P.O. Box 201030

Stockton, CA 95201

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Christopher Ryan Wolf

Attorney at San Joaquin County District Attorney

222 E Weber Ave., Room 202

Stockton, CA 95202-2709

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: Hull, Acting P.J., Duarte, J., Hoch, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition. Supplemental exhibit K. (21 pp.) Filed with permission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition. Petitioner's exhibit J. Manually filed on DVD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Petitioner's notice of manual filing of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or prohibition.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where District Attorney is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Joaquin County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant