This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/12/2022 at 01:15:40 (UTC).

Henry v. Cerego, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Henry filed an Other lawsuit against Cerego, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3549

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Paul Henry

Defendants, Appellants and Others

Cerego, Inc.

Eric Young

Appellant, Defendant and Other

Eric Young

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ali A Aalaei

Attorney at Ari Law P.C.

317 University Avenue Suite 100

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Benjamin Martin

Attorney at Ari Law, P.C.

317 University Ave., Suite 100

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Kenneth R. Van Vleck

Attorney at GCA Law Partners LLP

2570 West El Camino Real, Suite 510

Mountain View, CA 94040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: Upon request of counsel for appellant, the appeal is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Upon request of counsel for appellant, the appeal is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Cerego, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Cerego, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by check

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Cerego, Inc. Attorney: Kenneth R. Van Vleck Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS returned with message: Please resubmit with Order or Judgment that you are appealing attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Cerego, Inc.Attorney: Kenneth R. Van Vleck; Notes: Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 09/15/2021. Designating 8.124 without RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 09/07/2021 by Counsel for Defendants Cerego, Inc. and Eric Young appealing order from 09/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20585256

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Van Vleck, Kenneth R