This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/17/2022 at 04:08:55 (UTC).

Helix Media LLC v. Clark et al.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Helix Media LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Clark. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hofer, Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5990

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hofer, Ralph

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Helix Media LLC

Defendants and Appellants

Natalie Clark

Freya Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Denis Shmidt

Attorney at Orsus Gate LLP

16 N Marengo Ave, Ste 316

Pasadena, CA 91101-6140

Joseph I. Boufadel

Attorney at Salvato Law Offices

Wells Fargo Center 355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Robert James Winkler

315 S Coast Hwy 101 Ste U-533

Encinitas, CA 92024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Natalie Clark Attorney: Robert James Winkler Defendant and Appellant: Freya Holdings LLC Attorney: Robert James Winkler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Reply brief submitted on September 1, 2022 rejected this date for lack of bookmarks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Natalie ClarkAttorney: Robert James Winkler Defendant and Appellant: Freya Holdings LLCAttorney: Robert James Winkler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Helix Media LLC Attorney: Denis Shmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Helix Media LLCAttorney: Denis Shmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Natalie Clark Attorney: Robert James Winkler Defendant and Appellant: Freya Holdings LLC Attorney: Robert James Winkler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Natalie ClarkAttorney: Robert James Winkler Defendant and Appellant: Freya Holdings LLCAttorney: Robert James Winkler

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: ext aob to 6/20/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Law firm of Salvato Boufadel LLP associates in as co-counsel for respondent Helix Media LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (405 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Natalie Clark Attorney: Robert James Winkler Defendant and Appellant: Freya Holdings LLC Attorney: Robert James Winkler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Natalie ClarkAttorney: Robert James Winkler Defendant and Appellant: Freya Holdings LLCAttorney: Robert James Winkler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: R339092 Civil Filing Fee paid $775.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 1 - Filed Oct 7, 2021 - designating CT only 2 - Filed Oct 7, 2021 - proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 9/27/2021 by Natalie Clark et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21GDCV00658; Trial Court Judge: Hofer, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Freya Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINKLER ROBERT JAMES