This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/02/2022 at 18:36:01 (UTC).

HEJAZI v. DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 HEJAZI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0074

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Hamid Michael Hejazi

Eugene, OR 97401

Respondent and Defendant

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Attorney General - Sacramento Office

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket, petition for review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hamid Michael Hejazi Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hamid Michael Hejazi Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C094294; Disposition: Other involuntary dismissal; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 34202100298487CUMMGDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant