This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/16/2022 at 00:54:15 (UTC).

Heidhues v. Piron

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Heidhues filed an Other lawsuit against Piron. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandoval, Gerardo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1857

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sandoval, Gerardo

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Elizabeth Heidhues

Respondent

Antoine Piron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Judy L Hitchcock

Attorney at Legal Assistance To Elderly Inc

701 Sutter Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94109

Kimberly A. Fanady

Attorney at Law Offices of Kimberly A. Fanady

1 Sutter Street Suite 250

San Francisco, CA 94104

Thomas E. Drohan

Attorney at Legal Assistance To The Elderly

1663 Mission Street, Suite 225

San Francisco, CA 94103

Respondent Attorneys

Michael J. Coffino

3030 Bridgeway Suite 207

Sausalito, CA 94965

Stephanie J. Finelli

Attorney at Law Office of Stephanie J. Finelli

3110 S Street

Sacramento, CA 95816

 

Court Documents

A161857

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The judgment is affirmed. Piron shall recover his costs on appeal.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Tucher, Alison M.; Participants: Petrou, Ioana (Concur) Rodriguez, Victor A. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment is affirmed. Piron shall recover his costs on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Kimberly A. Fanady for Appellant and Stephanie J. Finelli for Respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Wednesday, January 19, 2022 at 10:00 AM. Each side will be permitted 10 minutes for argument.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: KImberly A. Fanady for Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record to court for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: 21-10.1

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Elizabeth Heidhues Attorney: Kimberly A. Fanady Corrected Civil case information statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Elizabeth HeidhuesAttorney: Kimberly A. Fanady; Notes: Corrected Civil case information statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Elizabeth Heidhues Attorney: Kimberly A. Fanady

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Elizabeth HeidhuesAttorney: Kimberly A. Fanady

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/21/2020 by Counsel for Petitioner Elizabeth Heidhues appealing judgment from 12/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CCH20582485; Trial Court Judge: Sandoval, Gerardo

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Judy L Hitchcock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DROHAN, THOMAS E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FANADY, KIMBERLY A.