This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/01/2021 at 20:20:52 (UTC).

Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Arjohuntleigh, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Arjohuntleigh, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mandel, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4536

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mandel, Elaine

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

Arjohuntleigh, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan A Stieglitz

11845 W Olympic Blvd Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Michael Alexander Bernet

Attorney at Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Seror Weber LLP

21650 Oxnard St Ste 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-4911

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Michael A. Bernet, for Respondent (20 minutes)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Jonathan Stieglitz, for Appellant (15 minutes)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: September 14, 2021 at 9:30 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC Attorney: Jonathan A Stieglitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLCAttorney: Jonathan A Stieglitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Edmon, P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on March 13, 2020 Additional Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Superior Court Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC Attorney: Jonathan A Stieglitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Rejected CIS submitted on March 09, 2020. Judgment/ order missing 8.100 (g)(1).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLCAttorney: Jonathan A Stieglitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on March 03, 2020 (8.122 w/RT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: NOA filed on Feb 24, 2020 by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLCHealthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, Plaintiff and Appellant Jonathan A Stieglitz, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No Fee Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed on Feb 24, 2020 by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: SC125267; Trial Court Judge: Mandel, Elaine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arjo-Century Distributing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNET MICHAEL A