This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/31/2023 at 11:00:32 (UTC).

HCP Mop California, LP v. Koletic et al.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 HCP Mop California, LP filed an Other lawsuit against Koletic. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Linfield, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6313

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Linfield, Michael

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

HCP Mop California, LP

Stella Koletic, D.D.S.

Appellant and Defendant

Stella Koletic, D.D.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M Medioni

Mark J. Rosenbaum

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final Feb 3, 2023 by HCP Mop California, LP (R1).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Partial Jan 31, 2023 by HCP Mop California, LP (R).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: Feb 3, 2023 appeal: (R1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: Jan 31, 2023 appeal: (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Partial Jan 13, 2023 by Stella Koletic, D.D.S.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Stella Koletic, D.D.S.It appearing that the appellant: Stella Koletic, D.D.S. is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed January 13, 2023, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 31, 2023: (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: HCP Mop California, LP Attorney: Daniel M Medioni [Appeal filed on Jan 31, 2023 (R)]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Pursuant to Rule 8.216(a) of the California Rules of Court, the parties must file a proposed briefing sequence within 20 days of the date of this notice. If the parties fail to stipulate to a briefing sequence, the Court will impose its own.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: HCP Mop California, LPAttorney: Daniel M Medioni; Notes: [Appeal filed Feb 3, 2023 (R1)]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: HCP Mop California, LPAttorney: Daniel M Medioni; Notes: [Appeal filed on Jan 31, 2023 (R)]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on Feb 3, 2023 by HCP Mop California, LP (R1).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #404072 for $775 from lasc. [Appeal filed on Jan 31, 2023 (R)]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on Jan 31, 2023 by HCP Mop California, LP (R).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received.[Appeal filed Jan 13, 2023]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on Jan 13, 2023 by Stella Koletic, D.D.S.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV24935; Trial Court Judge: Linfield, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less