This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/16/2023 at 06:08:17 (UTC).

Hawkes v. Westbrook

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Hawkes filed an Other lawsuit against Westbrook. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keosian, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0819

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keosian, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellant

William Hawkes

Respondent

James A. Westbrook

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Kousha Berokim

Respondent Attorneys

Michael Jeffrey Saltz

Elana Rebecca Levine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Appellant: William Hawkes Attorney: Kousha Berokim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Rejected appellant's reply brief-did not include Table of Contents, Table of Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Appellant: William HawkesAttorney: Kousha Berokim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Respondent: James A. Westbrook Attorney: Michael Jeffrey Saltz Two extensions granted for a total of 120 days: 10/31/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 01/03/2023 By 61 Day(s) 12/28/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/03/2023 By 59 Day(s) 01/04/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/03/2023 By 59 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 1 of 1. 152 total pages.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: William Hawkes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 15, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: William Hawkes Attorney: Kousha Berokim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on June 23, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: William HawkesAttorney: Kousha Berokim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Apr 5, 2022 by William Hawkes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC610791; Trial Court Judge: Keosian, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less