This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/02/2023 at 01:05:12 (UTC).

Hawkes v. Westbrook

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Hawkes filed an Other lawsuit against Westbrook. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keosian, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0819

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keosian, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellant

William Hawkes

Respondent

James A. Westbrook

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Kousha Berokim

Respondent Attorneys

Michael Jeffrey Saltz

Elana Rebecca Levine

 

Court Documents

B320819

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

12/18/2023

HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketDescription: Order denying publication filed.; Notes: To the Chief Justice and Associate Justices of the Supreme Court: Attached hereto is a copy of the opinion filed October 16, 2023, in the above-captioned case, which was not certified for publication. Also attached is a copy of the letter requesting publication of the opinion from Elana R. Levine, Esq., of Jacobson, Russell, Saltz, Nassim & de la Torre dated October 30, 2023. After reexamination and reconsideration of the matter of publication, we reaffirm our original decision not to publish the opinion. The opinion applied settled principles to the case at bench. The instant opinion therefore does not meet the publication standards set forth in rule 8.1105(c) of the California Rules of Court. Therefore, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.1120(b)(1), this court is referring this request to the Supreme Court with a recommendation court is referring th against publication.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketDescription: Filed request to publish opinion.; Notes: Request for publication, filed by counsel for respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The trial court order is affirmed. Respondent to recover his costs on appeal.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Adams, Rashida A.; Participants: Egerton, Anne Harwood (Concur) Edmon, Lee Smalley (Concur)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The trial court order is affirmed. Respondent to recover his costs on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, Division 3 TENTATIVE RULING - B320819, Hawkes v. Westbrook

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The court has read and considered appellant's late request for oral argument and calendar priority, filed October 6, 2023. The request for oral argument is granted. The request for priority is denied; the matter is already scheduled to be the first case called on the 1:30 P.M. calendar.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023

DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Kousha Berokim, Retained counsel for appellant request to present oral argument and also for calendar priority.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: FW: DIVISION 3 OCTOBER 10, 2023 ORAL ARGUMENT - ATTORNEY LINK (AFTERNOON CALENDAR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
09/28/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: William Hawkes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 15, 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: William Hawkes Attorney: Kousha Berokim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022

DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on June 23, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: William HawkesAttorney: Kousha Berokim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Apr 5, 2022 by William Hawkes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC610791; Trial Court Judge: Keosian, Gregory

[+] Read More [-] Read Less