This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/20/2022 at 22:04:06 (UTC).

Hart v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Hart filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LaForteza, Bernie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5844

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

LaForteza, Bernie

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shelly Hart

Westlake Village, CA 91362

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Bernie LaForteza

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Interested Parties

Teachers Insurance Annuity Association of America

C/O Csc 2710 Gateway Oaks Drive, Suite 150N

Sacramento, CA 95822

Teachers REA, LLC

C/O Csc 2710 Gateway Oaks Drive, Suite 150N

Sacramento, CA 95833

Greystar California, Inc.

Kimball Tirey & St. John, LLP

PGIM, Inc.

The Morgan Group

Triana Warner Center, LLC

PR Triana Warner Center, LLC

Valerie Baumgartner

Kristen Ruffin

LaSalle Investment Management, Inc.

LPF Triana, Inc.

Kyle Dupree

Courtney Sullivan, Legacy Partner's Inc.

Steven Sapp

Davin Ross

Deana Obrief & Tom Gibbons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Eric Robert McDonough

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

1925 Century Park E Ste 1900,

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2754

Jamie Jo Sternberg

Attorney at Kimball Tirey & St John

7676 Hazard Center Dr Ste 900-B

San Diego, CA 92108

Eli Allen Gordon

Attorney at Kimball Tirey & St. John, LLP

915 Wilshire Blvd. Ste 1650

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joseph C. Campo

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 W. Fifth Avenue Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Steven Parminter

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz,Edelman, Dicker

555 S. Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Ashan Kyle Peiris

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

555 S Flower St Ste 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2407

Justin Arnold Bubion

Attorney at Traub Lieberman Straus & Shrewsberry LLP

626 Wilshire Blvd Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2921

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S271676]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Filed by Shelly Hart in the Supreme Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed October 22, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: For petition for writ of mandate/prohibition/request for stay and two volumes of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two Volumes of Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Prohibition/Request for STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America is a litigant

Latest cases where PGIM INC. is a litigant