This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/18/2023 at 07:06:49 (UTC).

Hart v. Sullivan et al.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Hart filed an Other lawsuit against Sullivan. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Falls, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6136

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Falls, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Shelly Hart

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

Courtney Sullivan

Richard Carey

David Lucas

Robyn Christy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Justin Arnold Bubion

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

533 W. Lime Ave Apt. A

Monrovia, CA 91016-6758

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: [ . . . ] This court lacks jurisdiction to hear an appeal taken from a nonappealable order. (Sherman v. Standard Mines Co. (1913) 166 Cal. 524, 525 [attempt to appeal from nonappealable order does not give court jurisdiction or authority to review it].) An appeal taken from a nonappealable order must be dismissed. (Ibid.) The appeal initiated by the notice filed on December 30, 2022 is dismissed. (Sherman v. Standard Mines Co., supra, 166 Cal. at p. 525.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to this court's February 17, 2023 notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: notice designating record filed 1/9/2023 SCLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: notice of filing of notice of appeal (amended) dated 1/18/2023 SCLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The civil case information statement for the above-entitled appeal was received and filed on February 10, 2023. However, it is insufficient, as you did not attach a written, signed order or judgment of dismissal. (Code Civ. Proc. 581d.) Ordinarily, no appeal lies from an order sustaining a demurrer without leave to amend; it lies instead in the signed order or judgment of dismissal entered after the order sustaining the demurrer. (Code Civ. Proc., 904.1; Hill v. City of Long Beach (1995) 33 Cal.App.4th 1684, 1695; Mounger v. Gates (1987) 193 Cal.App.3d 1248, 1254.) Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this notice, provide the court with a conformed copy of the signed order or judgment of dismissal and proof of service showing that opposing parties have been served with a copy of the order or judgment. Failure to do so may result in the appeal being dismissed as taken from a non-appealable order. (Sherman v. Standard Mines Co. (1913) 166 Cal. 524, 525.) While an order or judgment of any length may be provided, if a written response is submitted with the order or judgment or in lieu of the order or judgment, the written response may not exceed three typewritten pages. No attachments or exhibits, other than the order or judgment, shall be filed with the response but may be lodged subject to the court's review and acceptance as filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid via credit card for Shelly Hart.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Shelly Hart Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Shelly HartPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed Dec 30, 2022 by Shelly Hart.Amended Notice of Filing attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV40526; Trial Court Judge: Falls, Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less