This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/28/2021 at 14:46:27 (UTC).

Harris v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Harris filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sahagun, Raul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3302

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sahagun, Raul

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jade D. Harris

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robin Francine Bernstein-Lev

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defenders Office

320 West Temple Street Room 590, Appellate Branch

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Ricardo Daniel Garcia

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender

210 W Temple St Fl 19

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3231

Albert J. Menaster

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender's Office

210 West Temple St

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3266

Lisa Anne Roth

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender's Office

320 West Temple Street Suite 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Thomas Stephen Moore

Attorney at Office of the Public Defender

320 West Temple St., Room 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Respondent Attorney

Hon. Raul Anthony Sahagun

Norwalk Courthouse, Department D 12720 Norwalk Blvd

Norwalk, CA 90650

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

John Edward McKinney

Attorney at Los Angeles County Distirct Attorney

211 W Temple St Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied. [S269619]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate filed on June 28, 2021 has been read and considered, and is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to the relief requested. (See Omaha Indemnity Co. v. Superior Court (1989) 209 Cal.App.3d 1266, 1273.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY. (CAPITAL CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant