This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/04/2021 at 13:22:59 (UTC).

HARRIS v. PROANO

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 HARRIS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against PROANO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0271

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Bernadine Harris

Respondents and Defendants

Fabian Proano

Melissa Barlow

Porano Family Trust

EPLA Property Management

Debra Wright

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan D. Winters

Attorney at Law Offices of Jonathan D. Winters

2750 Bellflower Boulevard, Suite 101

Long Beach, CA 90815

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Harry Aroutun Safarian

Attorney at THE SAFARIAN FIRM, APC

3150 Montrose Avenue

Glendale, CA 91214

Pierro H. Babaian

Attorney at The Safarian Firm, APC

3150 Montrose Avenue

Glendale, CA 91214

Richard Gower

Attorney at Macdonald & Cody, LLP

500 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christian Xavier Przybylowski

Attorney at Macdonald & Cody, LLP

500 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed; Notes: Bernadine Harris, Plaintiff and Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bernadine Harris Attorney: Jonathan D. Winters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bernadine Harris Attorney: Jonathan D. Winters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bernadine Harris Attorney: Jonathan D. Winters *** The Court of Appeal, 2nd Appellate District recommends the opinion not be published on the ground it does not meet the standards of publication. ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B305480; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC700417

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPLA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRZYBYLOWSKI CHRISTIAN XAVIER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BABAIAN PIERRO H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFARIAN HARRY A.