This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/28/2021 at 00:37:56 (UTC).

Hanson v. Wells Fargo Bank

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Hanson filed an Other lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Terry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4545

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Green, Terry

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Irene Hanson

Respondent and Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Hiller Borenstein

P.O. Box 885

Culver City, CA 90232

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Kerry W. Franich

Attorney at Severson & Werson

19100 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

David Allan Berkley

Attorney at Severson & Werson

19100 Von Karman Avenue Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

Jan T. Chilton

Attorney at Severson & Werson

One Embarcadero Center Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filling Fee of $775.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Irene Hanson Attorney: Peter Hiller Borenstein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Irene HansonAttorney: Peter Hiller Borenstein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Kerry Franich of Severson & Werson, replacing David Berkley as counsel of record for respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Further, counsel also request that Jan Chilton of Severson & Werson be listed as counsel for respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 19, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 4, 2021: Irene Hanson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV32556; Trial Court Judge: Green, Terry

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKLEY DAVID A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANICH KERRY W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jan T. Chilton