This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/21/2022 at 14:16:51 (UTC).

Haney v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Haney filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Burdge, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0217

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Burdge, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Valerie Haney

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Richard J. Burdge, Jr.

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Church of Scientology International

Religious Technology Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert William Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Law Offices, P.C.

700 Airport Blvd Ste 160

Burlingame, CA 94010-1931

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

William Hobbes Forman

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

300 South Grand Ave. 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Margaret E Dayton

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Ave. 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David C. Scheper

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert E. Mangels

Attorney at Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Seventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Matthew D. Hinks

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Seventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed May 11, 2022, the preliminary opposition filed May 23, 2022, and the motion for sanctions filed May 23, 2022. The petition is denied. The respondent court properly denied the motion for reconsideration pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 1008. The motion for sanctions is also denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Real Parties in Interest's motion for sanctions pursuant to California Rules of Court Rule 8.492

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee due by Real Parties in InterestResponsive filing fee paid by Diana Galvez.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Real Parties in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Defendants' exhibits to preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate (Volume 9, exhibits 45-55, pages 1859-2046)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Eight volumes of exhibits with descriptive bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Notice of non-compliance emailed to petitioner's counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 1 through 8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate (stay requested). (attorney Hamilton has not applied for pro hac vice permission in the Court of Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where RELIGIOUS TECHNOLOGY CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Mangels