This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/01/2023 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

Han v. Eshares, Inc. dba Carta

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 Han filed an Other lawsuit against Eshares, Inc dba Carta. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Roberta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0478

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hayashi, Roberta

 

Party Details

Respondents, Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

Frank Han

Eshares, Inc. dba Carta

Appellant, Defendant and Not Yet Classified

Eshares, Inc. dba Carta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Michael G. Ackerman

Eric Andrew Hiduke

Michael Alan Laurenson

Don Willenburg

Liza L. Christie

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Alan Laurenson

Don Willenburg

Liza L. Christie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/05/2023

HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-complainant and Respondent: Frank Han Attorney: Eric Andrew Hiduke Appellant's combined reply brief and cross-respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 12/05/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Eshares, Inc. dba CartaAttorney: Don Willenburg Attorney: Liza L. Christie Attorney: Michael Alan Laurenson

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff, Cross-complainant and Respondent: Frank HanAttorney: Eric Andrew Hiduke; Notes: Appellant's combined reply brief and cross-respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Eshares, Inc. dba Carta Attorney: Liza L. Christie Combined RBF/X-AOB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Eshares, Inc. dba CartaAttorney: Liza L. Christie; Notes: Combined RBF/X-AOB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent rescinding 8.220(a) notice.; Notes: Due to clerical error, a letter was issued on September 29, 2023, notifying counsel of failing to file the respondent's brief That notice has been rescinded, and the respondent's brief is due October 12, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: For clarification re briefing schedule; alternative request for ext. of time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: BY THE COURT: Having demonstrated that the exhibit was before the court, appellant's motion to augment record on appeal with Exhibit B, attached to the motion filed August 28, 2023, is granted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
11/21/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Frank Han (Cross-Appeal)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Frank Han, filed 10/28/2022 (Cross-Appeal)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketDescription: Proposed briefing sequence filed by:; Notes: 1. Plaintiff/Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief: 45 days after the record is filed; 2. Defendants-Appellants' Combined Respondents Brief and Appellants' Opening Brief: 45 days after Plaintiff-Appellant's Opening Brief; 3. Plaintiff/Cross--Appellant's Combined Reply and Cross-Respondents' Brief: 30 days after Defendants-Appellants' Combined Respondents Brief and Cross-Opening Brief; and 4. Defendants-Appellants' Reply Brief: 20 days from Plaintiff/Cross--Appellant's Combined Reply and Cross-Respondents Brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Filed 11/8/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Respondent's Civil Case Information Statement: You must attach to this form a copy of the judgment or order being appealed that shows the date it was entered (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104 for definition of "entered"). In addition, please submit an association of attorney for Michael G. Ackerman along with future filings as he was not previously declared a party to this case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Filed by Don Willenburg obo appellant with attached order of 8/19/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Eshares, Inc. dba Carta, filed 10/17/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 19CV360737; Trial Court Judge: Hayashi, Roberta

[+] Read More [-] Read Less