This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/17/2023 at 06:43:06 (UTC).

Han Realty et al. v. Palumbo et al.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Han Realty filed an Other lawsuit against Palumbo. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cotton, Jr., Huey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7641

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cotton, Jr., Huey

 

Party Details

Appellants and Not Yet Classified

Han Realty

David Westley

Victoria Westley

Cross Defendants and Respondents

Victor Palumbo

Nicole Palumbo

Adrian Karasek

First American Team, Inc.

Steve S. Sothier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Nick A. Alden

Cross Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Lisa L. Loveridge

Fredric J. Greenblatt

Jose Antonio Mendoza

Douglas Joseph Collodel

 

Court Documents

B317641

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: The Palumbos and cross-defendants are awarded their costs of appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S278979]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: E-sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S278979 - Filed by Appellant in the Supreme Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellants' motion to augment is denied. Appellants' petition for rehearing is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: petition for rehearing filed by appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: motion to augment record filed by appellants [sent to court for review and ruling]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final 20p./AFF/CLA; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Chavez, Victoria M.; Participants: Lui, Elwood (Concur) Benke, Patricia D. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) 20p./AFF/CLBThe good faith settlement order and disqualification order are affirmed. The Palumbos and cross-defendants are awarded their costs of appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorney Douglas J. Collodel of Clyde & Co US, LLP is associated in as counsel for Respondents First American Team, Inc., Steve Sothear Vong and Adrian Karasek.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant, Han Realty Corporation, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: The Notice of appearance submitted via Truefiling by Atty Douglas J Collodel on 2/1/2022 has been rejected. Association of counsel must be served and filed by the counsel of record for respondents First American Team, Inc., et al..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Han Realty Attorney: Nick A. Alden

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Han RealtyAttorney: Nick A. Alden

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing Fee of 775.00 Paid for Han Realty et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 12/9/2021 by Han Realty et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: LC104523; Trial Court Judge: Cotton, Jr., Huey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less