This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/13/2022 at 00:35:34 (UTC).

Haffner v. Perez

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Haffner filed an Other lawsuit against Perez. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is George, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3564

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

George, Virginia

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Rosemary Haffner

Respondent

Fernando Perez

Not Yet Classified

Perez Living Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Robert R. Cross

Attorney at Skootsky & Der LLP

90 New Montgomery St., Ste. 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ryan Judson Meckfessel

Attorney at Skootsky & Der LLP

90 New Montgomery St Ste 600

San Francisco, CA 94105-4549

Gerald A. Clausen

Attorney at Law Office of Gerald Clausen

555 Montgomery St., Suite 605

San Francisco, CA 94111

Respondent Attorneys

Michael Alexander Schreiber

Attorney at The Demiris Law Firm, P.C.

700 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 140

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Konstantine A. Demiris

Attorney at Demiris Law Firm, PC

700 Ygnacio Valley Rd., Suite 140

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 07/13/2022 By 30 Day(s) RB to 7/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: 1 Volume (pp. 1-524)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Rosemary Haffner Attorney: Gerald A. Clausen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/13/2022; Party Attorney: Respondent: Fernando PerezAttorney: Konstantine A. Demiris Attorney: Michael Alexander Schreiber

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Rosemary HaffnerAttorney: Gerald A. Clausen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Rosemary Haffner Attorney: Robert R. Cross Gerald Clausen, attorney for appellant, w/copy of order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent Associates Law Office of Gerald Clausen as co-counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Rosemary HaffnerAttorney: Robert R. Cross; Notes: Gerald Clausen, attorney for appellant, w/copy of order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 09/22/2021; rule 8.124 w/RTs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check No. 11565

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed on 9/22/21 to an order after judgment under CCP 904.4(a)(2) (no date given for order or judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHREIBER, MICHAEL A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMIRIS, KONSTANTINE A