This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/19/2022 at 02:01:36 (UTC).

Hadjinian v. Alvie

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Hadjinian filed an Other lawsuit against Alvie. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Kathleen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4630

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kelly, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Adam Hadjinian

Respondent and Defendant

Nabeel Alvie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Douglas McLachlan

Attorney at McLachlan Law, APC

2447 Pacific Coast Hwy Ste 100

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254-2760

Jason Reilly Doucette

Attorney at McLachlan Law, APC

2447 Pacific Coast Hwy Ste 100

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254-2760

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Andrew Schweigerdt

Attorney at Jeanette N. Little & Associated

4450 Rose Drive Suite 450

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Michael Hyun Park

Attorney at Mark R Weiner & Associates

655 North Central Avenue 12Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: "Notice designating record on appeal was not timely filed as required by Rule 8.121(a) and (b) of the California Rules of Court. As this defect has not been cured, it is hereby requested that this appeal be dismissed pursuant to California Rules of Court 8.140." by: D. Louie, deputy clerk date: Mar. 22, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Deadline was 03/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: respondents Nabeel and Kiran Alvie. Associated counsel: Michael Park, Mark R. Weiner & Associates 655 North Central Avenue, 12th Floor Glendale, CA 91203-1242

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: Mar. 3, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid via credit card by McLachlan Law, APC, attorneys for appellant Hadjinian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 02/18/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Adam Hadjinian appealing judgment from 12/21/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC19576370; Trial Court Judge: Kelly, Kathleen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Hyun Park

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWEIGERDT, TIMOTHY