This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/21/2023 at 06:06:08 (UTC).

Gylfie v. Costco Wholesale Coporation

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Gylfie filed an Other lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Coporation. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Goorvitch, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0694

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Goorvitch, Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Richard Gylfie

Defendant and Respondent

Costco Wholesale Coporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Zulu Abdullah Ali

Attorney at Law Office Of Zulu Ali

2900 Adams St, Ste C13

Riverside, CA 92504

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Stephen Mark Harber

Attorney at McCune & Harber, LLP

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: TWO: Clerks (456 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: notice to appellant of proceedings not reported or recorded, dated 7/14/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to this court's notice sent June 20, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 15, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The civil case information statement filed on June 15, 2022 for the appeal filed on May 5, 2022 is deficient as it does not have attached the appealed March 9, 2022 order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) You must provide the Court with a conformed copy of the March 9, 2022 order, with a proof of service attached (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2)), within 15 days of the date of this notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Richard Gylfie Attorney: Zulu Abdullah Ali

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on 6/14/2022 has been rejected because it does not include the order or judgment being appealed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 02/06/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Richard GylfieAttorney: Zulu Abdullah Ali

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Richard GylfieAttorney: Zulu Abdullah Ali

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Appeal filed May 5, 2022 by Richard J. Gylfie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed May 5, 2022 by Richard J. Gylfie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV27692; Trial Court Judge: Goorvitch, Stephen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARBER STEPHEN M. ESQ