This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/21/2021 at 00:03:45 (UTC).

Gurzanski v. Cloobeck

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Gurzanski filed an Other lawsuit against Cloobeck. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Riff, Lawrence. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5025

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Riff, Lawrence

 

Party Details

Respondent and Petitioner

Stefanie Gurzanski

Appellant

Stephen J. Cloobeck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

Arthur H. Barens

Attorney at Law Offices of Arthur H. Barens

10209 Santa Monica Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6494

Appellant Attorney

Adam Pines

Attorney at Glaser, Weil, Fink, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd. 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Stephen J. Cloobeck Attorney: Adam Pines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Stephen J. CloobeckAttorney: Adam Pines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# 396223 for $775.00 (LA Depositions, Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 8/23/2021 by Stephen Cloobeck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STRO00183; Trial Court Judge: Riff, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PINES ADAM