This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/02/2022 at 21:53:17 (UTC).

Gupta v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Gupta filed an Other lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fannin, Jill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2364

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fannin, Jill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Praveen Gupta

Defendant and Respondent

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Sarah E. Shapero

Attorney at Shapero Law Firm

100 Pine St., Suite 530

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Michael R Gonzales

Jared Daniel Bissell

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

11682 El Camino Real Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92130-2092

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Attorney address changed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Sarah E. Shapero old address 1: One Market Street, Spear Tower, 36th Fl new address 1: 100 Pine St., Suite 530 old zip: 94105 new zip: 94111 old phone: (415) 293-7995 new phone: (415) 273-3504

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons submitted by respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Michael Gonzales substituted out, Jared D. Bissell new counsel for Nationstar Mortgage LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 04/22/2021. Designating CT without RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Praveen Gupta Attorney: Sarah E. Shapero Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Praveen GuptaAttorney: Sarah E. Shapero; Notes: Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 30695, D & T Services, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 04/02/2021 by Counsel for Plaintiff Praveen Gupta appealing judgment from 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1902211; Trial Court Judge: Fannin, Jill

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPERO, SARAH E