This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/23/2022 at 00:01:11 (UTC).

Group Independent Sales Organization v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Group Independent Sales Organization filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Meiers, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1039

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Meiers, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Group Independent Sales Organization

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Barbara A. Meiers

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

American Verification Processing Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Babak Hashemi

Attorney at Hashemi Law Firm, APC

20062 Sw Birch, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Benjamin Martin

Attorney at Hashemi Law Firm, APC

20062 Sw Birch, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Daniel Yehuda Zohar

Attorney at Zohar Law Firm, P.C.

1100 Glendon Ave. Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final It appearing from the notice of settlement, filed August 2, 2022, that the matter has been settled as a whole, the petition filed June 20, 2022 is hereby dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: It appearing from the notice of settlement, filed August 2, 2022, that the matter has been settled as a whole, the petition filed June 20, 2022 is hereby dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of settlement of petition for writ of mandate and entire action.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Petitioner's response to the June 21, 2022 emailed notice from clerk's office. [Verification included]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Notice of non-compliance being emailed to petitioner's counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOHAR DANIEL Y.