This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2023 at 00:10:54 (UTC).

Grossmont Union High School District et al. v. San Diego Plus Education et al.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Grossmont Union High School District filed an Other lawsuit against San Diego Plus Education. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Danielsen, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0295

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Danielsen, David

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Grossmont Union High School District

San Diego Unified School District

Defendants and Respondents

San Diego Plus Education

Lifelong Learning Administration

Educational Advancement Corporation

Western Education Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah Sutherland

Attorney at Orbach Huff & Henderson

2877 Historic Decatur Rd., #200

San Diego, CA 92106

Andra Michele Greene

Attorney at San Diego Unified School District

4100 Normal Street Room 2148

San Diego, CA 92103

John Morris

Attorney at Higgs Fletcher & Mack

401 West A Street, Ste 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Gregory Mark Bordo

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher Jens Petersen

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park E 6Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF. Due on 02/14/2023 By 62 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred; Notes: Appellants' request for judicial notice, filed November 14, 2022, will be considered concurrently with the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: joint request by appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Grossmont Union High School District Attorney: Sarah Sutherland Joint Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Due Date: 02/14/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: San Diego Plus EducationAttorney: Christopher Jens Petersen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Grossmont Union High School DistrictAttorney: Sarah Sutherland; Notes: Joint Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: last

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: SDUSD associates IN Higgs Fletcher & Mack

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Grossmont Union High School District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Atty Sutherland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 4/14/22 CT and RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 4/6/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 4/6/22 CT and RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 3/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 3/10/22 by Grossmont Union High School District and San Diego Unified School District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2015-00033720-CU-WM-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Danielsen, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Educational Advancement Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Grossmont Union High School District is a litigant

Latest cases where San Diego Unified School District is a litigant