This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/02/2023 at 18:23:40 (UTC).

Gropen v. Wu et al.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 Gropen filed an Other lawsuit against Wu. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, Blaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1743

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bowman, Blaine

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Moss Gropen

Respondents and Defendants

Fang Wu

Danielle Greer

Michael J Noud

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert James Lynch

Matthew Allen Slater

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin John Howard

Mark Christopher Krok

Clark R. Hudson

Thomas Michael Peabody

Aaron David Burden

Andrew Kentfield Whitman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/22/2023

HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2023

HearingDescription: Opposition filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF. Due on 12/22/2023 By 18 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: R/10 (Remote)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: ***EXHIBITS LODGED BY: ******; Notes: Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits Per Respondent, Danielle Greer, D.O.'s Designation of Record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 11/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Michael J Noud Attorney: Aaron David Burden

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Fang Wu Attorney: Mark Christopher Krok Defendant and Respondent: Danielle Greer Attorney: Mark Christopher Krok

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Due Date: 12/22/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Moss GropenAttorney: Matthew Allen Slater Attorney: Robert James Lynch

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
03/30/2023

DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 1/9/23 by Moss Gropen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Appellant's Designation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Moss Gropen Attorney: Robert James Lynch

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketBrief: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Moss GropenAttorney: Robert James Lynch

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 2/24/23 by Moss Gropen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2021-00030296-CU-MM-NC; Trial Court Judge: Bowman, Blaine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less