This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/11/2023 at 10:37:21 (UTC).

Greisman v. FCA US, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Greisman filed an Other lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson, Earl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6919

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Nelson, Earl

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Miriam Greisman

Defendants and Respondents

FCA US, LLC

Carmax Auto Superstores California, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Tionna Grace Dolin

Marshall Ryan Cole

Vikram Sohal

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

James P. Mayo

Rebecca Grace Powell

Lisa Perrochet

John Barrow Sprangers

Jon David Universal

Spencer P. Hugret

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: To court.; Notes: appellant's motion to augment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/25/2023 By 17 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 09/25/2023 By 17 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to augment record on appeal; CT and proposed order attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/08/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 09/08/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 08/09/2023 By 30 Day(s) AOB to 8/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: EOT Granted to 5/24/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension requested.; Notes: CSR J. Balentine to 5/24/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, counsel of record for respondents associates the frim of Horvitz & Levy LLP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 1/13/23; 15 days to cure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Miriam Greisman Attorney: Vikram Sohal Vikram Sohal, attorney for appellant, w/copy of order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Vikram Sohal, attorney for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 09/25/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Miriam GreismanAttorney: Marshall Ryan Cole Attorney: Tionna Grace Dolin Attorney: Vikram Sohal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Miriam GreismanAttorney: Vikram Sohal; Notes: Vikram Sohal, attorney for appellant, w/copy of order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # D5036200, InfoTrack US, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/16/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Miriam Gresiman appealing order from 11/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: FCS051933; Trial Court Judge: Nelson, Earl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less