This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2022 at 12:01:35 (UTC).

GREGG v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 GREGG filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9000

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Jonathon Gregg

Appellants and Defendants

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Rasier-CA, LLC

Not Yet Classified

Desai Law Firm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

David R. Lira

Attorney at Girardi & Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017-1904

Thomas V. Girardi

Attorney at Girardi & Keese

126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Mark T. Bennett

Attorney at SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPHY & PINKNEY LLP

2240 5Th Avenue

San Diego, CA 92101

Jahan C. Sagafi

Attorney at Outten & Golden LLP

3239 Casa Grande Drive

San Ramon, CA 94583

Rachel W. Dempsey

Attorney at Outten & Golden LLP

3239 Casa Grande Drive

San Ramon, CA 94583

Stephen J. Schultz

Attorney at Slovak, Baron, Empey, Murphy & Pinkney, LLP

2240 5Th Avenue

San Diego, CA 92101

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Michael Spurchise

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

900 Third Ave., 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Sophia Behnia

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

333 Bush Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-2842

Blair Copple Senesi

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

333 Bush Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-2842

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Aashish Yadvendra Desai

Attorney at Desai Law Firm

3200 Bristol Street, Suite 659

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The requests for an order directing publication of the opinion are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Notice of New Authority Uber Technologies, Inc., Defendant and Appellant Sophia Behnia, Retained counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Rasier-CA, LLC, Defendant and Appellant Sophia Behnia, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Jonathon Gregg Attorney: Jahan C. Sagafi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (petition for review pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Desai Law Firm Attorney: Aashish Yadvendra Desai

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Uber Technologies, Inc. Attorney: Sophia Behnia Defendant and Appellant: Rasier-CA, LLC Attorney: Sophia Behnia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302925; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC719085

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aashish Y. Desai