This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/01/2021 at 05:54:11 (UTC).

Greene v. The People ex rel. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Greene filed an Other lawsuit against The People ex rel DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Melzer, Layne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0178

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Melzer, Layne

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Madonna Greene

Respondents and Defendants

State of California, Department of Transportation

The People ex rel. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Samer Sami Habbas

Attorney at Law Offices of Samer Habbas

200 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 1230

Irvine, CA 92618

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

James Warren Marvel

Attorney at State of California, Department of Transportation, Legal Division- MS 130

4050 Taylor Street

San Diego, CA 92110-1987

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Samer Habbas will argue for appellant - 20 minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Deputy AG James Marvel will argue for respondent- 10 minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Argument letter sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Madonna Greene Attorney: Samer Sami Habbas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: ARB was rejected. Pagination needs to be corrected. Cover page needs to begin with page 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: ARB was rejected. Missing bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Madonna GreeneAttorney: Samer Sami Habbas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: The People ex rel. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION Attorney: James Warren Marvel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Respondent's brief was rejected for not having the TOC/TOA, word count, and proof of service bookmarked.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: 1 RT (pgs. 1 - 13)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 1 CT (pgs. 1 - 231) - ELECTRONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: C. Violette-Makino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 5/7/2021 - proceeding with CT's and RT's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's designation of record was rejected at filers request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: for CCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: Madonna Greene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01153943; Trial Court Judge: Melzer, Layne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNIA-DEPARTMENT OF PARKS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Warren Marvel