This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/05/2023 at 01:21:55 (UTC).

Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc. et al. v. City of Montclair

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against City of Montclair. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9531

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants, Appellants and Plaintiffs

Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc.

Charles Hohman

Respondent, Not Yet Classified and Defendant

City of Montclair

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Stanley Howard Kimmel

Respondent, Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorneys

Caroline Karabian Castillo

Eric Philip Markus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: An extension was granted pursuant to stipulation. Respondent is notified of no further extensions.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/02/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc. Attorney: Stanley Howard Kimmel Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Charles Hohman Attorney: Stanley Howard Kimmel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/02/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Respondent: City of MontclairAttorney: Caroline Karabian Castillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc.Attorney: Stanley Howard Kimmel Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Charles HohmanAttorney: Stanley Howard Kimmel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc. Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Charles Hohman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc. Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Charles Hohman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: The motion to augment is granted, and the document copies attached to the motion as exhibits 1 and 2 are deemed a part of the record on appeal. (23 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: motion to augment record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: **VACATED PER ORDER OF OCT 6, 2022**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Aug 26, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Aug 3, 2022; Green Lotus Entertainment, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS1827316; Trial Court Judge: Cohn, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less