This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/30/2022 at 00:26:33 (UTC).

Gossai v. Fison-Randler et al.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Gossai filed an Other lawsuit against Fison-Randler. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stern, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6075

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stern, Michael

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Bobby Gossai

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Respondent and Defendant

Zoleta Fison-Randler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Joanne Mirras Knauss

Attorney at Knauss Law Group, a Professional Corp

250 Lombard St, Ste 7

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

 

Court Documents

B316075

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Lavin, Luis A.; Participants: Egerton, Anne Harwood (Concur) Edmon, Lee Smalley (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment of dismissal is reversed in part, and affirmed in part. On remand, the court shall enter a new order overruling the demurrer to the first cause of action for breach of contract. The parties shall bear their own appellate costs. Panel: Lavin, J., Edmon, P. J. and Egerton, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: by Appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Joanne M. Knauss, for Respondent (20 minutes).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: June 15, 2022 at 01:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bobby Gossai Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bobby GossaiPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bobby GossaiPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (151 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Request for Mediation. (Cannot file because participation in court's program requires all parties to be represented by counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Oct. 15, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee Waiver granted on Nov 3, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bobby Gossai Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Oct 15, 2021 by Bobby Gossai

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bobby GossaiPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV19414; Trial Court Judge: Stern, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS